TX SB674 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to licensing for certain health professions, including an expedited process for certain physicians specializing in psychiatry; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to licensing for certain health professions, including an expedited process for certain physicians specializing in psychiatry; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1630 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26SenateRecord vote
2017-05-26SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenatePassed
2017-03-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-15SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-02-15SenateRead first time
2017-01-30SenateFiled
2017-01-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback