TX SB670 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appointment of the commissioners of the health and human services agencies by the governor.
Title
Relating to the appointment of the commissioners of the health and human services agencies by the governor.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] |
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1748 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Nominations |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF