TX SB669 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the availability of online testing for high school equivalency examinations.
Title
Relating to the availability of online testing for high school equivalency examinations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-08 | Record vote | |
2009-04-08 | Passed | |
2009-04-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-08 | Record vote | |
2009-04-08 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-08 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-08 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-08 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-08 | Amended | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-31 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Education | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-03 | Filed | |
2009-02-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Electronic Information Systems
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Electronic Information Systems