TX SB63 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the property tax appraisal system, including an entitlement to a tax exemption based on the appraised value of certain renewable energy devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the property tax appraisal system, including an entitlement to a tax exemption based on the appraised value of certain renewable energy devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1476 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28SenateRecord vote
2021-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-28SenateRead
2021-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1476
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24HouseAmended 1-Button
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenatePassed
2021-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-23SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-21SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-04-15SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-02-09SenateCo-author authorized
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3509 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB2100 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Ways & Means

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB63
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00063I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00063S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00063E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00063H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00063F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00063H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00063I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00063I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00063S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00063S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00063E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00063H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00063H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00063F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00063F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-23-F.PDF#page=1
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB63&RcdVtNo=1476&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=75
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-23-F.PDF#page=1

Bill Comments 750

feedback