TX SB62 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to permitting the Texas Ethics Commission to provide seminars and charge an attendance fee for those seminars.
Title
Relating to permitting the Texas Ethics Commission to provide seminars and charge an attendance fee for those seminars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1478 (Y: 117 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#1478 |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |