TX SB59 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to energy and water management planning and reporting requirements for state agencies and institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to energy and water management planning and reporting requirements for state agencies and institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1642 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-05SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-05SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2016-11-14SenateFiled
2016-11-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback