TX SB579 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of the Concacaf Gold Cup for funding under the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of the Concacaf Gold Cup for funding under the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1472 (Same As) 2021-05-15 - Effective immediately