TX HB1472 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of the Concacaf Gold Cup for funding under the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of the Concacaf Gold Cup for funding under the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. David Spiller [R] | Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#252 (Y: 109 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Amended RV#221 (Y: 110 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#252 (Y: 109 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Amended RV#221 (Y: 110 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Effective immediately | |
2021-05-15 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-03 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#252 |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-14 | House | Record vote RV#221 |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-14 | House | Amended 1-Bucy |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB579 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Left pending in committee