TX SB529 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to improving training and staff development for primary and secondary educators to enable them to more effectively serve all students.
Title
Relating to improving training and staff development for primary and secondary educators to enable them to more effectively serve all students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING