TX SB522 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the use of personal leave by a public school employee.
Title
Relating to the use of personal leave by a public school employee.
Sponsors
Sen. Kip Averitt [R] | Rep. Rob Eissler [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Effective immediately | |
2009-05-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Signed in the House | |
2009-04-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-04-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-29 | House passage reported | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Education | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-01-23 | Filed | |
2009-01-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB462 (Same As) 2009-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
SICK LEAVE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
SICK LEAVE