TX HB462 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on December 22 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the use of personal leave by a public school employee.
Title
Relating to the use of personal leave by a public school employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-04-27 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-04-27 | Postponed | |
2009-04-27 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-21 | Postponed | |
2009-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2008-12-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB522 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
SICK LEAVE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
SICK LEAVE