TX SB515 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to investigations of child abuse and neglect and the procedures for adding names to or removing names from the central registry of child abuse and neglect.
Title
Relating to investigations of child abuse and neglect and the procedures for adding names to or removing names from the central registry of child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hall |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Electronic Information Systems
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Electronic Information Systems
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
RECORDS MANAGEMENT