TX SB408 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of certain complaints to and investigations by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of certain complaints to and investigations by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions