TX SB390 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuing issuance of freshwater fishing stamps by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Relating to the continuing issuance of freshwater fishing stamps by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Postponed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2011-03-29 | Read first time | |
2011-03-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-23 | Record vote | |
2011-03-23 | Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-23 | Record vote | |
2011-03-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-23 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2011-01-21 | Filed | |
2011-01-21 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses