TX SB390 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to confidentiality of certain information under the public information law and in local tax appraisal records regarding federal law enforcement officers.
Title
Relating to confidentiality of certain information under the public information law and in local tax appraisal records regarding federal law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-17 | Record vote | |
2009-04-17 | Passed | |
2009-04-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-17 | Record vote | |
2009-04-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-17 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-12-31 | Filed | |
2008-12-31 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER PATROL AGENTS
CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, US
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, US
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information