TX SB36 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to creation of a higher education task force focused on mental health services and the offense of hazing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to creation of a higher education task force focused on mental health services and the offense of hazing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1515 (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1515
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-25HouseAmended 1-C. Turner
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-04-13HouseRead first time
2021-04-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-08SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenatePassed
2021-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB36
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00036I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00036S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00036E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00036H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00036F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00036H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00036I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00036I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00036S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00036S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00036H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00036F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00036F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-08-F.PDF#page=23
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB36&RcdVtNo=1515&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=40

Bill Comments

feedback