TX SB336 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to credit toward payment of a fine and costs for certain misdemeanants confined in jail or prison before sentencing.
Title
Relating to credit toward payment of a fine and costs for certain misdemeanants confined in jail or prison before sentencing.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB828 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB336 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00336I.htm |