TX SB2431 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Harris County Flood Control District; providing for the appointment of the governing body.
Title
Relating to the Harris County Flood Control District; providing for the appointment of the governing body.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
GULF COAST RESILIENCY DISTRICT
HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB2431 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB02431I.htm |