TX SB23 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for a capital felony committed by an individual younger than 18 years of age.
Title
Relating to the punishment for a capital felony committed by an individual younger than 18 years of age.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Rep. Stefani Carter [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - House - SB 23Third Reading House (Y: 95 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 6 by McClendon (Y: 89 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2013-06-23 - House - SB 23Third Reading House (Y: 93 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-06-23 - House - SB 23Third Reading House (Y: 35 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2013-06-23 - House - SB 23Third Reading House (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 6 by McClendon (Y: 89 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2013-06-23 - House - SB 23Third Reading House (Y: 93 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-06-23 - House - SB 23Third Reading House (Y: 35 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2013-06-23 - House - SB 23Third Reading House (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-06-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-24 | House | Passed |
2013-06-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-24 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-06-24 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-06-24 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-06-24 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-06-24 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-06-24 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-06-24 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-06-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-23 | House | Postponed |
2013-06-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-23 | House | Motion to table fails |
2013-06-23 | House | Motion to postpone |
2013-06-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-06-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-23 | House | Postponed |
2013-06-23 | House | Resumed consideration |
2013-06-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-06-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-06-21 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-06-21 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2013-06-21 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-06-21 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2013-06-21 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2013-06-21 | House | Amendment amended |
2013-06-21 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-06-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-06-21 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2013-06-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-06-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-06-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-06-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-06-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-06-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-06-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Passed |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Filed |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |