TX SB2244 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the University Hills Municipal Management District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments or fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the University Hills Municipal Management District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments or fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1995 (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-05-11HouseRead first time
2017-05-08HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-08SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-08SenateRecord vote
2017-05-08SenatePassed
2017-05-08SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-08SenateRecord vote
2017-05-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24SenateRecommendations filed with the Senate
2017-04-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-04-03SenateRead first time
2017-03-15SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2017-03-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2244
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02244I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02244S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02244E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02244H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02244F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2244&RcdVtNo=1814&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-08-F.PDF#page=20
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2244&RcdVtNo=1995&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=57

Bill Comments

feedback