TX SB2179 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]


Relating to the applicability of certain insurance laws to certain farm mutual insurance companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the applicability of certain insurance laws to certain farm mutual insurance companies.


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]


2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-29SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments