TX SB2076 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of digital license plates; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the issuance of digital license plates; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1711 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Subjects
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLE BOARD
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
MOTOR VEHICLE BOARD
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2076 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02076I.htm |