TX SB2063 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment and administration of the Texas Safe Home Demonstration Program.
Title
Relating to the establishment and administration of the Texas Safe Home Demonstration Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |