TX SB198 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to restrictive covenants regulating drought-resistant landscaping or water-conserving natural turf.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to restrictive covenants regulating drought-resistant landscaping or water-conserving natural turf.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - House - SB 198Third Reading House (Y: 88 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-20SenateHouse passage reported
2013-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-20HouseRecord vote
2013-05-20HousePassed
2013-05-20HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2013-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-17HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-08HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2013-04-08HouseRead first time
2013-03-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-03-18SenateReported engrossed
2013-03-18SenateRecord vote
2013-03-18SenatePassed
2013-03-18SenateRead 3rd time
2013-03-18SenateRecord vote
2013-03-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-03-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-03-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-03-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-03-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-03-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-03-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-03-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-03-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-01-29SenateReferred to Natural Resources
2013-01-29SenateRead first time
2013-01-22SenateFiled
2013-01-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback