TX SB1936 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the beginning and ending possession times in certain standard possession orders in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
Title
Relating to the beginning and ending possession times in certain standard possession orders in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1518 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1518 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1518 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Amendment withdrawn 1-Middleton and Raymond |
2021-05-26 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2021-05-26 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Middleton and Raymond |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-25 | House | Amended 1-Dutton |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-08 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3203 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB3203 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB3203 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21