TX SB1929 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application of the professional prosecutors law to the district attorney for the 287th Judicial District.
Title
Relating to the application of the professional prosecutors law to the district attorney for the 287th Judicial District.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-09 | Permission to introduce | |
2011-05-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |