TX SB1895 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the assessment of administrative penalties under the Texas Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
Relating to the assessment of administrative penalties under the Texas Workers' Compensation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1292 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed |
2017-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |