TX SB1890 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of uniform grant and contract management standards to certain Texas Water Development Board programs.
Title
Relating to the applicability of uniform grant and contract management standards to certain Texas Water Development Board programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 4036 |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4036 (Same As) 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB4036 (Same As) 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB4036 (Same As) 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call