TX SB1837 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to financial accountability standards for charter schools operated by a public institution of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to financial accountability standards for charter schools operated by a public institution of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-12HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-11HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenatePassed
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback