TX SB1835 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain contract and notice requirements for the cancellation of a health spa membership.
Title
Relating to certain contract and notice requirements for the cancellation of a health spa membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2023-05-24 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |