TX SB1812 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the determination of state contributions for participation by certain junior college employees in the state employees group benefits program, the Teacher Retirement System of Texas, and the Optional Retirement Program.
Title
Relating to the determination of state contributions for participation by certain junior college employees in the state employees group benefits program, the Teacher Retirement System of Texas, and the Optional Retirement Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Duncan [R] | Rep. John Otto [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - SB 1812Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-13 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2013-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Education--Junior College Districts
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations