TX SB1783 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guardianships, alternatives to guardianship, and supports and services for incapacitated persons.
Title
Relating to guardianships, alternatives to guardianship, and supports and services for incapacitated persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-13 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
GUARDIANS & WARDS
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Courts
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
GUARDIANS & WARDS
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts