TX SB1766 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to indemnification and duties of real property appraisers under certain governmental contracts.
Title
Relating to indemnification and duties of real property appraisers under certain governmental contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1370 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Passed RV#1369 (Y: 117 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Passed RV#1369 (Y: 117 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1370 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2584 |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2023-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2584 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2584 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2584 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS
City Government--Employees/Officers
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS