TX HB2584 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to indemnification and duties of real property appraisers under certain governmental contracts.
Title
Relating to indemnification and duties of real property appraisers under certain governmental contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1766 |
2023-05-03 | House | Postponed 5/8/23 9:00 AM |
2023-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-04-27 | House | Postponed 5/3/23 9:00 AM |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS
City Government--Employees/Officers
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS