TX SB1753 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-20 - Referred to Finance
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-20 - Referred to Finance
Summary
Relating to the procedure for reallocating local sales and use taxes.
Title
Relating to the procedure for reallocating local sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-20 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1377 (Similar To) 2009-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1844 (Similar To) 2009-03-04 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB1844 (Similar To) 2009-03-04 - Referred to Ways & Means