TX SB1701 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a criminal asset forfeiture hearing in which substitute assets are forfeited under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to a criminal asset forfeiture hearing in which substitute assets are forfeited under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Aliseda [R] | Rep. Wayne Christian [R] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] | Rep. Will Hartnett [R] |
Sen. Tommy Williams [R] | Rep. William Zedler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-11 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-10 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-09 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-12 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-11 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-11 | Record vote | |
2011-04-11 | Passed | |
2011-04-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-11 | Record vote | |
2011-04-11 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-11 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-11 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-11 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-11 | Amended | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-11 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-31 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |