TX SB1658 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duties of and investigations conducted by the Texas Forensic Science Commission, the administrative attachment of the Texas Forensic Science Commission to Sam Houston State University, and the accreditation of criminal laboratories by the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas.
Title
Relating to the duties of and investigations conducted by the Texas Forensic Science Commission, the administrative attachment of the Texas Forensic Science Commission to Sam Houston State University, and the accreditation of criminal laboratories by the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-22 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-20 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-13 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Amended | |
2011-05-13 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Amended | |
2011-05-13 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-13 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-10 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
FORENSIC SCIENCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
FORENSIC TESTING
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
Science & Technology
Criminal Procedure--General
FORENSIC SCIENCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
FORENSIC TESTING
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
Science & Technology