TX SB1589 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of laws relating to elections.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of laws relating to elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SECRETARY OF STATE
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SECRETARY OF STATE