TX SB1519 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of a public entertainment facility and the promotion, sponsorship, or advertising of an entertainment event or venue or alcoholic beverage at certain governmentally owned public entertainment facilities.
Title
Relating to the definition of a public entertainment facility and the promotion, sponsorship, or advertising of an entertainment event or venue or alcoholic beverage at certain governmentally owned public entertainment facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADVERTISING
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
Amusements, Games, Sports
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
Amusements, Games, Sports
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General