TX SB1395 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of navigation districts and port authorities.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of navigation districts and port authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1432 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
DESALINATION
FRANCHISES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
DESALINATION
FRANCHISES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility