TX SB1384 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of certain legislation on contract carriers as the Justin Little Act.
Title
Relating to the designation of certain legislation on contract carriers as the Justin Little Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1384 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1384 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Common Carriers
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
JUSTIN LITTLE ACT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
JUSTIN LITTLE ACT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road