TX SB1353 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the content of certain immunization records and of certain biennial legislative reports on immunizations issued by the Department of State Health Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the content of certain immunization records and of certain biennial legislative reports on immunizations issued by the Department of State Health Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-14HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-05HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-05-05HouseRead first time
2021-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenatePassed
2021-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1353
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01353I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01353S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01353E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01353H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01353F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01353I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01353I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01353S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01353S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01353H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01353F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1353&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021

Bill Comments

feedback