TX SB1334 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the lease, rental, and donation to the United States of certain facilities relating to a toll bridge by certain counties and municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the lease, rental, and donation to the United States of certain facilities relating to a toll bridge by certain counties and municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#721 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Effective immediately
2021-05-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-06 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-06HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-06SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-05SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-05SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#721
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 2843
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenatePassed
2021-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-23SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2843 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1334
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01334I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01334S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01334E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01334H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01334F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01334I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01334I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01334S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01334S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01334E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01334H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01334F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-23-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1334&RcdVtNo=721&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-23-F.PDF#page=3

Bill Comments 750

feedback