TX HB2843 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the donation to the United States of certain facilities relating to a toll bridge by certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the donation to the United States of certain facilities relating to a toll bridge by certain municipalities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2021-05-04HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 1334
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1334 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback