TX SB1309 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to assessment alternatives or accommodations for certain public school students in special education programs.
Title
Relating to assessment alternatives or accommodations for certain public school students in special education programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Sen. Robert Deuell [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Rep. Bennett Ratliff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-15 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-05-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing