TX SB1230 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Legislative Committee on Aging and other initiatives relating to the aging population of this state.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Legislative Committee on Aging and other initiatives relating to the aging population of this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed | |
2009-03-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB610 (Similar To) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Aging
AGING, LEGISLATIVE COMMITTEE ON
Human Services
Human Services--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
AGING, LEGISLATIVE COMMITTEE ON
Human Services
Human Services--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed