TX SB1203 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the regulation of metal recycling entities; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of metal recycling entities; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-18 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-13 | Recommitted to committee | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-22 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time | |
2009-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-20 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-20 | Record vote | |
2009-04-20 | Passed | |
2009-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-20 | Record vote | |
2009-04-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-20 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-20 | Amended | |
2009-04-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed | |
2009-02-27 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4454 (Similar To) 2009-04-08 - Withdrawn from schedule
HB4524 (Same As) 2009-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4524 (Same As) 2009-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SECONDHAND METAL
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SECONDHAND METAL