TX SB1200 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to referrals to and consent to services under certain programs designed to serve pregnant women and families.
Title
Relating to referrals to and consent to services under certain programs designed to serve pregnant women and families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-05-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2332 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Human Services
HB2490 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Received from the House
HB2490 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Received from the House
Subjects
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women