TX HB2490 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to referrals to and consent to services under certain programs designed to serve pregnant women and families.
Title
Relating to referrals to and consent to services under certain programs designed to serve pregnant women and families.
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#335 (Y: 115 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#335 |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-19 | House | Amended 1-Oliverson |
2021-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1200 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Referred to Public Health
SB1200 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Referred to Public Health
SB1200 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Referred to Public Health