TX SB1200 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Military Preparedness Commission and strategic planning regarding military bases and defense installations.
Title
Relating to the Texas Military Preparedness Commission and strategic planning regarding military bases and defense installations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-17 - House - SB 1200Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-17 | House | Amended |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2013-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-17 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-11 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Legislature
Military & Veterans
MILITARY PREPAREDNESS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
REGIONAL PLANNING COMMISSIONS
TEXAS COMMANDER'S COUNCIL
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
VETERANS' LAND BOARD
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Legislature
Military & Veterans
MILITARY PREPAREDNESS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
REGIONAL PLANNING COMMISSIONS
TEXAS COMMANDER'S COUNCIL
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
VETERANS' LAND BOARD